U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cm-50045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bozarth
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Revocation Judgment]
  • October 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 06, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arrest]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.