U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08245-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • December 10, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • November 29, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • November 17, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.