U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • May 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 13, 2022: [Docket Call]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • March 24, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 02, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • January 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.