U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cr-10030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McFadden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 06, 2022: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • May 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.