U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03202
  • Case Name: Kansas, State of v. Gilbert
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Appeal]
  • November 18, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • November 18, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • November 18, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 13, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 12, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
  • September 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.