U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02410
  • Case Name: Beckingham v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • December 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.