U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01230
  • Case Name: Slonecker v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 12, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Discovery Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 24, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.