U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01126
  • Case Name: Hein et al v. Mai
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 27, 2024: [Strike]
  • September 27, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.