U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02224
  • Case Name: Deleon et al v. Medicalodges, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Settlement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.