U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01001
  • Case Name: Linlor v. Holman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 10, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 10, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • December 25, 2024: [Leave]
  • December 24, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.