U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02361
  • Case Name: Bahner et al v. USD 321 Kaw Valley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • May 08, 2025: [ADR Report]
  • May 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • April 29, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Setting Telephone Conference]
  • February 11, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 26, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.