U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02394
  • Case Name: Casteel v. Washburn University Institute of Technology
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • May 12, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Joint Mediation Notice]
January, 2025
  • January 03, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Reassigning Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.