U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02081
  • Case Name: Rasmussen et al v. Foundation for Affordable Housing
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Index of Exhibits]
  • May 08, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Compel]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • September 30, 2024: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.