U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cv-01185
  • Case Name: Jackson v. LM General Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 04, 2025: [Leave]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 02, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.