U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-20046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gauna et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Continuance of Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Presentence Report /Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea (to court)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.