U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02217
  • Case Name: Lidgett v. T-Mobile USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Expert Witness Designation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 10, 2024: [Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.