U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10738
  • Case Name: Ashlyn Victoria Lewis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice To Allow Claims]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payments]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payment]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Claim]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.