U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11258
  • Case Name: Barry B Brecheisen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Chapter 11 Certificate of Voting]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Supplement to Claim Secured by Principal Residence, Rule 3002(c)(7)]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Chapter 11 Plan]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Adams, Kent L [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.