U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11168
  • Case Name: American Warrior Construction, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Sell [e.g. § 363(b), 363(f), FRBP 6004]]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Deadline for Submission of Order]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Deadline for Submission of Order]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Sell [e.g. § 363(b), 363(f), FRBP 6004]]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continuation of Utility Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic Text Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Substitute Attorney Or Withdraw As Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Substitute Attorney Or Withdraw As Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Opinion]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Chapter 11 Exclusivity Period]
December, 2024
  • December 13, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.