U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-07009
  • Case Name: Kaplan v. Deutsche Bank National Trust as Trustee for WaMu M
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Objection]
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Objection]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Rule 7026 Initial Disclosures]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Objection Deadline]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Brief]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Rule 7026 Initial Disclosures]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 19, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting]
  • March 12, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Report of Parties Planning Meeting]
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.