U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40889
  • Case Name: Edward Scott Lang and Ann Bernadette Lang
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.