U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40023
  • Case Name: Colten Grey Angel and Jamie Lynn Angel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Notice of Objection Deadline]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Fix Claim Owner]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.