U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20166
  • Case Name: Joshua Michael Wood
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.