U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20225
  • Case Name: Ronald James Bowe and Lisa Jones Bowe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Abandon]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.