U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10091
  • Case Name: Katherine M. Herd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Relief from Stay]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Update Other Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Generic]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Upon Converting Case To Chapter 7]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Statement of Intent]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Voluntary Conversion from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Conversion from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.