U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20242
  • Case Name: Kent Alan Strand
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Change of Address]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.