U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-40022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cerca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Application for Writ of Continuting Garnishment]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2025: [SEALED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.