U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02437
  • Case Name: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Blanchard et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • March 10, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.