U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20243
  • Case Name: Adelinda NMN Umana
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.