U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20271
  • Case Name: Jeffrey Allen Jordan and Patricia Jean Jordan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Borrow]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.