U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-21515
  • Case Name: Joshua Virgil High and Rhiannon Nichole High
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Sell]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.