U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-07011
  • Case Name: Omaha Creek Trailer Sales, Inc. and Beau Barclay v. Patmon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 14, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • May 12, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Trial Reminder Letter]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Objection Deadline]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Order]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Order]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 12, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Generic Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.