U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21650
  • Case Name: Stacy Lynn Lago and Kevin Scott Lago
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.