U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04117
  • Case Name: Pageler v. Prairie Winds Family Care, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.