U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40776
  • Case Name: Stacy Noel Hawks
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Clerk's Notice of Service of Text Order]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Continue Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Clerk's Notice of Service of Text Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Hearing Set (Motion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.