U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11148
  • Case Name: Robert Allen Wilson and Kacie Rae Rourke
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [D.Kan.LBR 3001.1(D)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Closing Information]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Closing Information]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Flags Set-Reset]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.