U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10123
  • Case Name: Avery Michael Goering and Brooke Allison Goering
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.