U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20166
  • Case Name: Jenna Marie Hull
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.