U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40101
  • Case Name: Maya Joy Raney-Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Intended Compromise]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Closing Information]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Closing Information]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Intended Compromise]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employ]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.