U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21645
  • Case Name: Dylan Duran Dekoning
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Compel]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Response]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Update Discharge Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Extend/Shorten Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.