U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10110
  • Case Name: Charlene K Lasiter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection Deadline]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.