U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20097
  • Case Name: Danny Ray Neugent, II
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.