U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11210
  • Case Name: Aaron D Florez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Flags Set-Reset]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.