U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40112
  • Case Name: Michael Lyle Lockhart, Jr and Crystal Liegh Lockhart
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.