U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40095
  • Case Name: Andrew Charles Everett and Rachel Marie Everett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.