U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20543
  • Case Name: Charles David Plotner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Sell [e.g. § 363(b), 363(f), FRBP 6004]]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.