U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20889
  • Case Name: Monica Rae Allen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Update Other Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report (UST Filed)]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Closing Information]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Closing Information]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Interim Report]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Affidavit]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Generic]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.