U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40509
  • Case Name: Andrew Kent Kuker and Eleasha Kay Kuker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Post-Confirmation Amendment of Plan]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Order]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Sell]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Change of Address]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Support Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Sell [e.g. § 363(b), 363(f), FRBP 6004]]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Notice of Objection Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amend Plan (Post-Confirmation)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.