U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10009
  • Case Name: Indira Maine Andres-Francisco
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Final Financial Management Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.