U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-11188
  • Case Name: Karen L Cummings
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Redeem]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Approving Final Report & Account]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.